Financial history THE LITTLE HEATH SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1098656
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016
Total gross income £17.38k £99.88k £11.61k £9.96k £5.63k
Total expenditure £108 £26.59k £26.58k £191 £240.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A