PROJECT COLT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Day Treatment Rehabilitation Programme Pre & Post Detox Support and Through Care into Work Counselling and Mentoring Service Self-Esteem Course/s for Men/Women Addiction Training for Volunteers and Counsellors Seminars and Workshops
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Calderdale
- Kirklees
Governance
- 30 June 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Macaulay | Chair | 13 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Lesley Josephine Maslen | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Kieran Gian Malko | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Mitchell | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Bernard McMahon | Trustee | 22 January 2014 |
|
|||||
DANNY BARKER | Trustee | 23 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.75k | £168.02k | £95.13k | £119.85k | £160.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.29k | £104.80k | £109.14k | £128.76k | £118.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £16.97k | £4.48k | £2.04k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 22 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 22 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 22 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 22 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 23 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 23 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 22 MAY 2003
Charitable objects
(A) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE SICK (PARTICULARLY THOUGH NOT EXCLUSIVELY AS A RESULT OF DRUG AND ALCOHOL ADDICTION) AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN CALDERDALE AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT (B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE COMMUNITY (PARTICULARLY THOUGH NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN REGARD TO DRUG-FREE HEALTHY LIVING) IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY CONSIDER APPROPRIATE IN THE SAID LOCATION AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Area of benefit
CALDERDALE AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
PROJECT COLT MILL
BRIDGEFIELD MILLS
ELLAND
WEST YORKSHIRE
HX5 0SQ
- Phone:
- 01422485200
- Email:
- jan@projectcolt.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window