TIME FOR GOD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Time for God aims to provide quality volunteering opportunities through which God changes lives. We have more than 50 years of experience working with young adults who serve full-time in placements across Great Britain on a variety of volunteering programmes. Time for God is a Christian volunteering and training organisation founded by the major Christian denominations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Belgium
- Czech Republic
- France
- Germany
- Hungary
- Ireland
- Italy
- Netherlands
- Norway
- Poland
- Russia
- Scotland
- Slovakia
- South Africa
- South Korea
- Spain
- Sweden
- Ukraine
- United States
Governance
- 10 February 2004: Standard registration
- TIME FOR GOD TRAINING (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pete Twilley | Chair | 13 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Hutchings | Trustee | 17 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Lawrence Regan | Trustee | 26 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ida Birungi | Trustee | 26 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Andrew Graham Johnston | Trustee | 16 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Adrian Smith | Trustee | 03 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
NICK GOULD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £228.17k | £163.34k | £195.52k | £214.83k | £274.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £325.13k | £186.43k | £172.06k | £164.48k | £229.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £70.14k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 20 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 20 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 03 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 03 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 APRIL 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 19 JANUARY 2004.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND DEVELOP VOLUNTARY WORK AND VOLUNTEERING OPPORTUNITIES AND OTHER SIMILAR CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION, CHRISTIAN FAITH AND DEVELOPMENT OF VOLUNTEERS AND OTHERS BY PROVIDING TRAINING, DEVELOPMENT, ADVICE, INFORMATION AND ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE UK,GERMANY,AUSTRIA,FRANCE,SPAIN,HUNGARY,SWEDEN,NETHERLANDS,BELGIUM,LUXEMBOURG, EIRE,NORWAY,DENMARK,GHANA,KENYA,UGANDA,ZIMBABWE,S.KOREA & AUSTRALIA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
York Hub
Popes Head Court Offices
Peter Lane
YORK
YO1 8SU
- Phone:
- 01423536248
- Email:
- office@timeforgod.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window