Accounts and annual returns ENGAGE - THE BRIGHTON & HOVE CHURCHES COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1101534
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2016 04 May 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2015 23 December 2016 146 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 Not Required