Accounts and annual returns NICARAGUA SOLIDARITY CAMPAIGN LIMITED

Charity Number: 1106881
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 19 May 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2021 19 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 19 August 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 30 July 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 September 2020 On Time