Financial history NICARAGUA SOLIDARITY CAMPAIGN LIMITED

Charity Number: 1106881
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £104.76k £83.69k £72.25k £71.90k £52.00k
Total expenditure £101.38k £89.19k £90.47k £90.06k £85.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A