Accounts and annual returns MAKING MUSIC MATTERS

Charity number: 1099518
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 02 March 2009 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2007 24 November 2008 298 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 21 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 29 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 29 January 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 31 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 31 January 2006 On Time