Trustees CHESTER MUSIC SOCIETY
Charity number: 1099094

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Elizabeth Lea | Trustee | 22 January 2025 |
|
|||||
John Richard Ferrari | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jane RUSSELL | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Jonathan Penn | Trustee | 18 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Fay Clarke | Trustee | 22 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MARGARET TAYLOR | Trustee | 06 December 2016 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL CLARKE | Trustee | 04 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
DR EDMUND BERKELEY RANBY MBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr DAVID JOHN TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.