LOUTH SPIRITUAL COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Divine Services, Spiritual Healing, Workshops, Bereavement Counseling, Psychic Demonstrations and Suppers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 19 November 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GILLIAN SEAR | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Miss Roz Riggall | Trustee | 10 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
MICHELE ELAINE MUTTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.69k | £334 | £2.13k | £4.84k | £7.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.91k | £1.88k | £3.79k | £4.09k | £5.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 February 2024 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 February 2022 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 NOVEMBER 2003.
Charitable objects
A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE RELIGION AND RELIGIOUS PHILOSOPHY OF SPIRITUALISM BY THE HOLDING OF RELIGIOUS SERVICES FOR PUBLIC WORSHIP. B) THE TRAINING OF ALL IN THE PRINCIPLES OF THE RELIGIOUS PHILOSOPHY AND SCIENCE OF SPIRITUALISM. C) TO PROMOTE PUBLIC HEALTH BY THE PROMOTION OF SPIRITUAL HEALING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY EDUCATING AND TRAINING HEALERS AND BY ENSURING PROPER STANDARDS IN THE PRACTICE OF SPIRITUAL HEALING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
9a Mercer Row
LOUTH
Lincolnshire
LN11 9JG
- Phone:
- 07954003141
- Email:
- peaceinlouth@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
louthspiritualcommunitycentre.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window