CARLISLE KEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Work with young people aged 16-25 years of age who are homeless or experiencing housing & related issues by the provision of advice, support and accommodation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cumbria
Governance
- 23 September 2003: Standard registration
- COMMUNITY PROJECTS CARLISLE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Alan Wills | Trustee | 16 April 2025 |
|
|||||
JOHN MALLINSON | Trustee | 12 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Michael Edward Vose | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pauline May Colla | Trustee | 21 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £142.76k | £354.99k | £330.65k | £286.50k | £216.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £170.54k | £247.74k | £249.44k | £265.08k | £274.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.69k | £161.00k | £15.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/06/2003 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 20/01/2012 as amended on 05 Dec 2018 as amended on 01 May 2019
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OF YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 16 - 25, IN CARLISLE AND DISTRICT BY THE PROVISION OF EMERGENCY OVERNIGHT ACCOMMODATION AND OTHER RELATED SERVICES AND TO ENCOURAGE THEM TOWARDS INDEPENDENT LIVING.
Area of benefit
CARLISLE AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
123-127
Botchergate
CARLISLE
Cumbria
CA1 1RZ
- Phone:
- 01228595566
- Email:
- admin@carlislekey.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window