LYMPHOEDEMA RESEARCH FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting and promoting medical and scientific research focused primarily on lymphatics and the lymphatic system with a view to achieving advances in the prevention, diagnosis and treatment of lymphoedema and other disorders of the lymphatic system.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 September 2003: Standard registration
- 20 September 2021: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 20 September 2021: Funds transferred to 1171195 ST GEORGE'S HOSPITAL CHARITY
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.00k | £29.93k | £0 | £0 | £47 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.80k | £1.75k | £603 | £2 | £904 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 31 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 05 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | 05 September 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11 JUNE 2003
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME AND THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OF THE CAPITAL FOR THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC BY ENGAGING IN OR SUPPORTING MEDICAL AND SCIENTIFIC RESEARCH INTO LYMPHOEDEMA AND OTHER LYMPHATIC RELATED DISORDERS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window