HANNAN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sponsorship and raising funds to enable children in the Khenifra area attend school. raising funds to build school in El Borj village. relief of poverty in El Borj and Assaka villages Khenifra and Morocco.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Morocco
Governance
- 03 December 2003: Standard registration
- FAITH SCHOOL - EL BORJ (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HMAD NAATIT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Keira Radice | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Oscar Daniel Amenos | Trustee | 04 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
MRS HANNAH NAATIT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CLIFFORD UGOCHUKWU | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.84k | £19.00k | £17.00k | £24.78k | £20.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.41k | £19.75k | £16.00k | £15.56k | £22.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 05 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14 JUNE 2003 AS AMENDED BU SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 18 NOVEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED 3 MARCH 2007 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 05 JAN 2017
Charitable objects
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT INCLUDING BY MEANS OF ESTABLISHING AND OPERATING AND PLAYGROUPS; NURSERIES; SCHOOLS OR ADULT EDUCATION FACILITIES IN EL BORJ, MOROCCO; ENGLAND & WALES AND EUROPE. (2) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT INCLUDING BY MEANS OF PROVIDING FOOD AND CLOTHING TO THOSE IN NEED IN EL BORJ, MOROCCO; ENGLAND AND WALES AND EUROPE AND GIVING ADVISORY SERVICES TO THOSE IN NEED IN THE AFORESAID PLACES.
Area of benefit
EL BORJ, MOROCCO, BUCKINGHAMSHIRE, EUROPE AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 RHODES PLACE
OLDBROOK
MILTON KEYNES
MK6 2LU
- Phone:
- 01908200622
- Email:
- hannanschool@sky.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window