THE DEREK GOULD AWARD FOR OUTSTANDING EFFORT IN ACCOUNTANCY STUDIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Hampshire
Governance
- 27 November 2003: Standard registration
- 19 August 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2004 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2004 | 17 August 2005 | 139 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20 MARCH 2003 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 8 AUGUST 2003.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF AN ANNUAL AWARD FOR OUTSTANDING EFFORT IN ACCOUNTANCY STUDIES IN MEMORY OF DEREK GOULD.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window