Financial history ONESPIRIT INTERFAITH FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1099163
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £445.41k £435.52k £420.25k £341.39k £295.40k
Total expenditure £443.93k £334.23k £428.23k £389.93k £360.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A