Governing document ONESPIRIT INTERFAITH FOUNDATION

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02 MAY 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 NOV 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02 NOV 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04 MAR 2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 18 APR 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 DEC 2016 as amended on 10 May 2018
Charitable objects
TO BENEFIT THE PUBLIC BY THE EDUCATION OF MATURE ADULTS IN THE CORE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICES OF THE WORLD'S RELIGIONS, FAITHS AND SPIRITUAL TRADITIONS; PRINCIPLES AND METHODS OF FORGIVENESS, RECONCILIATION AND PEACEMAKING; AND THE PRACTICE OF THE NON-DENOMINATIONAL SPIRITUAL AND PASTORAL SERVICE IN THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.