Trustees ONESPIRIT INTERFAITH FOUNDATION
Charity Number: 1099163

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Tricia McLeod | Trustee | 30 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Mark Barber | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Downer | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sonia Thompson | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marco Fernandez | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tabi Haller-Jorden | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Fujo Malaika | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Lewis | Trustee | 08 October 2022 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.