Financial history JOHN LALLY INTERNATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1100100
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £18.25k £27.25k £15.78k £20.34k £21.63k
Total expenditure £22.89k £14.35k £20.19k £19.07k £28.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.43k £2.67k N/A N/A