MINISTRY OF EMPOWERMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Empowering women and families to be holistically well; socially, emotionally, mentally, physically, and spiritually regardless of faith and background. Use of activities: that provides personal development, build confidence, skills, and abilities to raise aspirations, access opportunities, develop better Life Choices, and promote community cohesion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Brent
- Bromley
- Croydon
- Dudley
- Lambeth
- Lewisham
- Merton
- Milton Keynes
- Nottinghamshire
- Sutton
Governance
- 21 October 2003: Standard registration
- WOMEN'S MINISTRY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DOROTHY JOHNSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Lola Adeyi | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Thomas-Asante | Trustee | 18 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Bailey | Trustee | 18 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev ALTHEA SMITH | Trustee | 27 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Faith Thomas | Trustee | 31 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Charlene Nelson | Trustee | 31 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Lurline Deslandes | Trustee | 07 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
NATALIE RIGG | Trustee | 07 January 2010 |
|
|
||||
ANGELICA DALRYMPLE-MCCALLUM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GLORIA WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.90k | £14.18k | £19.55k | £25.96k | £19.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.00k | £13.71k | £11.80k | £16.92k | £26.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2022 | 359 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2022 | 359 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 NOVEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED 21 SEPTEMBER 2003 as amended on 05 Aug 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION THROUGH ACTIVITIES OF THE MINISTRY EMPOWERMENT (WOMEN'S MINISTRY) BY ENCOURAGING WOMEN TO LIVE A GOOD CHRIST - LIKE LIFE BY TEACHING THE PRINCIPLES LAID DOWN IN THE BIBLE BY OUR LORD JESUS CHRIST
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
MINISTRY OF EMPOWERMENT
Lighthouse Centre
24-26 Salop Street
Dudley
West Midlands
DY1 3AT
- Phone:
- 07378744281
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window