RACE EQUALITY IN TOWER HAMLETS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Take steps to a cohesive, harmonious Society among people of different ethnic, racial, faith, nationality & language groups or backgrounds; Support EDUCATION, research & probing activities and take lawful ways for countering, ending discrimination; support persons in need & at risk in accord with the aims & objects; provide rights advocacy within resources & PUBLISH supporting aims and objects
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 01 September 2003: Standard registration
- REITH (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN WATTS | Trustee | 31 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
MUHAMMAD HAQUE | Trustee | 23 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.41k | £9.64k | £978 | £890 | £9.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.31k | £9.58k | £964 | £890 | £9.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 13 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 08 April 2024 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 20 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 18 JULY 2003. as amended on 24 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
(1) TO WORK TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF RACIAL DISCRIMINATION; AND (2) TO PROMOTE EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY, AND GOOD RELATIONS, BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS; ESPECIALLY IN THE BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS (HEREINAFTER KNOWN AS THE REC'S "AREA OF BENEFIT")
Area of benefit
THE BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 2
18 Harrow Road
Strictly correspondence
Address for legal correspondence
No visitors permitted at address
E6 1JS
- Phone:
- 07518632096
- Email:
- EDSTHISTLEWAITEDEE@AOL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window