LANGO COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1099947
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide education, vocational training and support to people living in developing countries in particular but not exclusively the people living in Lango in northern Uganda by the provision of education, vocational training and support as means of relieving their poverty.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £1,693
Total expenditure: £1,735

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London
  • Uganda

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 October 2003: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • LCT (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANNE AMUNO OKELLO Chair
GRACEMERCY PROPHETIC PRAYER MINISTRIES
Received: On time
MOSES LENGA Trustee 07 September 2019
None on record
GRACE ATIM Trustee 09 June 2019
None on record
MILDRED RUTH AKULLO OGWAL Trustee 09 June 2019
None on record
DEBORAH ADONG OKELLO Trustee 09 June 2019
None on record
SAM KUNIHIRA KARUHANGA Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.31k £3.56k £1.87k £1.72k £1.69k
Total expenditure £1.40k £360 £3.62k £2.98k £1.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 26 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 22 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
78 COPPERFIELD DRIVE
LONDON
N15 4UF
Phone:
07708052024