HARPER ADAMS UNIVERSITY DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust raises funds to support the work of Harper Adams University. It's principal aim is to finance student scholarships, particularly for those students who need financial aid to pursue their course of study, and to help generate income to support building projects that assist the University to achieve it's primary educational purpose.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income:
£512,821
Donations and legacies | £504.94k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £7.88k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£501,679
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £501.68k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £501.68k | |
Retained for future use | £11.14k |
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 15 July 2003: Standard registration
- HARPER ADAMS UNIVERSITY COLLEGE DEVELOPMENT TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Hambleton | Chair | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Farley | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Niamh Molloy | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Comfort Tevera | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Alexander Ivor Ferguson | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mandy Thorn | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joan Cole | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Ken Sloan | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Matthew Blaken | Trustee | 12 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Ward | Trustee | 10 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £387.47k | £794.47k | £388.19k | £594.59k | £512.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £449.45k | £718.62k | £476.06k | £502.29k | £501.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £794.43k | N/A | £565.08k | £504.94k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £37 | N/A | £29.52k | £7.88k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | £30.00k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £718.62k | N/A | £502.29k | £501.68k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £5.25k | N/A | £0 | £6.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £300.00k | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £577.94k | N/A | £587.74k | £669.68k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £4.80k | N/A | £6.70k | £77.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 17 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 17 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11/06/2003 AS AMENDED ON 07/11/2012 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 13/02/2013
Charitable objects
BY THE PURSUIT OF THE SPECIFIED PURPOSES HEREINAFTER DEFINED TO FURTHER THE OVERRIDING OBJECTIVE (HEREINAFTER SO CALLED) NAMELY THE PROVISION IN SUCH MANNER AS SHALL BE CHARITABLE AT LAW OF EDUCATION (AND IN PARTICULAR HIGHER EDUCATION) FOR PERSONS SEEKING TO BE OR PRESENTLY ENGAGED IN THE MANAGEMENT AND USE OF RURAL LAND OR IN INDUSTRIES PROFESSIONS AND COMMUNITIES RELATED TO RURAL LAND WHETHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR IN ANY OTHER PART OF THE WORLD AND IN PARTICULAR TO FOSTER THE INTERESTS OF HARPER ADAMS UNIVERSITY COLLEGE OF NEWPORT IN SHROPSHIRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE COLLEGE") BEING IN THE OPINION OF THE ORIGINAL TRUSTEES AN ESTABLISHMENT WHICH IS DEDICATED TO THE OVERRIDING OBJECTIVE. "THE SPECIFIED PURPOSES" SHALL MEAN THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES SO FAR AS EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AT LAW NAMELY SUCH PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY CONSIDER TO BE LIKELY TO ASSIST IN THE ATTAINMENT OF THE OBJECTS OF THE COLLEGE OR OTHERWISE LIKELY TO FURTHER THE OVERRIDING OBJECTIVE (INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING (A) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES EQUIPMENT OR FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE WHEREBY, AND; (B) THE UNDERTAKING OR ENCOURAGEMENT OF RESEARCH INTO THE WAYS IN WHICH PERSONS ENGAGED OR SEEKING TO BE ENGAGED IN THE MANAGEMENT AND USE OF RURAL LAND OR IN INDUSTRIES PROFESSIONS AND COMMUNITIES RELATED TO RURAL LAND MAY BE ENABLED TO BE EDUCATED WHETHER AT THE COLLEGE OR ELSEWHERE FOR THE PURPOSE OF PUTTING SUCH LAND TO GOOD ECONOMIC ENVIRONMENTAL OR SCIENTIFIC USE) AND GENERALLY THE SECURING OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE ENDS AS THEY SHALL CONSIDER TO BE CONDUCIVE TO THE OVERRIDING OBJECTIVE.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGODM OR IN ANY OTHER PART OF THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Harper Adams University
Edgmond
NEWPORT
TF10 8NB
- Phone:
- 01952815095
- Email:
- dtaylor@harper-adams.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window