THE FRIENDS OF HILBRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Conservation work such as control of invasive species, painting and repairs to walls and fences, litter picking, Open Days with Seal Watching for the public when refreshments are sold, a Mobile Information Unit, a Quarterly Newsletter for members and a website. Raising funds for conservation and community use of Hilbre from local, regional, national and European sources.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Wirral
Governance
- 19 May 2004: Standard registration
- 12 July 2024: Funds received from 701518 HOYLAKE HISTORICAL SOCIETY
- FOH (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patricia Oates | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Singh | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Forshaw | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary McMillan | Trustee | 03 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Tony Lamberton | Trustee | 02 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
David John Gregson | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANDY WILLIAMS | Trustee | 27 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA FLORENCE BURTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE MARGARET LONGWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.07k | £1.37k | £4.10k | £2.59k | £5.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.05k | £759 | £720 | £1.68k | £2.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 JUNE 2001 AS AMENDED ON 28 MAY 2003 AND 11 SEPTEMBER 2003.
Charitable objects
(I) TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF HILBRE ISLAND LOCAL NATURE RESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, VOLUNTEER HELP, EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES AND OTHER RELATED CHARITABLE GOODS AND SERVICES (II) TO OFFER PRACTICAL HELP UNDER THE GUIDANCE OF THE APPROPRIATE OFFICER OF THE LOCAL AUTHORITY
Area of benefit
HILBRE ISLAND LOCAL NATURE RESERVE
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Oaklea Road
Irby
WIRRAL
CH61 3US
- Phone:
- 0151 648 7115
- Email:
- Infohilbreisland@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window