ALTERNATIVES WATFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Alternatives offers life-changing emotional and practical support for anyone facing pregnancy-related challenges. We offer counselling, a baby box project and we have a Mother & Baby charity shop in Watford & Hemel Hempstead, Hertfordshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 13 October 2003: Standard registration
- GIRL ABOUT AND CONNECTIONS (Working name)
- CONNECTIONS (WATFORD) LONDON LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barbie Jane Pocklington | Chair | 23 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Corinne Laura Marchand | Trustee | 31 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Jane Robinson | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Hawkings | Trustee | 13 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Chris Strevens | Trustee | 03 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £127.16k | £161.45k | £104.34k | £79.53k | £46.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £128.27k | £107.25k | £103.26k | £78.48k | £87.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.50k | £86.13k | £8.89k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/10/2002 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 23/02/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A PLACE OF INFORMATION AND SUPPORT FOR THE YOUNG WOMEN IN WATFORD WHO HAVE A NEED FOR IT. IT WILL PROVIDE FREE PREGNANCY TESTS AND AN ADVISORY SERVICE, GIRL ABOUT MEETING AREA FOR THEM TO COME TOGETHER FOR HELP AND SUPPORT FOR EACH OTHER. (A) TO PURCHASE, TAKE ON OR LEASE OR IN EXCHANGE, HIRE OR OTHERWISE ACQUIRE REAL OR PERSONAL PROPERTY AND RIGHTS OR PRIVILEGES, AND TO CONSTRUCT, MAINTAIN AND ALTER BUILDINGS OR ERECTIONS. (B) TO SELL, LET, MORTGAGE, DISPOSE OF OR TURN TO ACCOUNT ALL OR ANY OF THE PROPERTY OR ASSETS OF THE COMPANY. (C) TO UNDERTAKE AND EXECUTE ANY CHARITABLE TRUSTS WHICH MAY LAWFULLY BE UNDERTAKEN BY THE COMPANY. (D) TO BORROW OR RAISE MONEY ON SUCH TERMS AND ON SUCH SECURITY AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT. (E) TO INVEST THE MONEYS OF THE COMPANY NOT IMMEDIATELY REQUIRED FOR ITS PURPOSES IN OR UPON SUCH INVESTMENTS, SECURITIES OR PROPERTY AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, SUBJECT NEVERTHELESS TO SUCH CONDITIONS (IF ANY) AND SUCH CONSENTS (IF ANY) AS MAY FOR THE TIME BEING BE IMPOSED OR REQUIRED BY LAW AND SUBJECT ALSO AS HEREINAFTER PROVIDED. (F) TO ESTABLISH AND SUPPORT OR AID IN THE SUPPORT OF ANY CHARITABLE ASSOCIATIONS OR INSTITUTIONS AND TO SUBSCRIBE OR GUARANTEE MONEY FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES. (G) TO DO ALL SUCH OTHER THINGS AS ARE INCIDENTAL TO THE ATTAINMENT OF FURTHERANCE OF THE SAID OBJECTS OR ANY OF THEM.
Area of benefit
WATFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 3
160 Marlowes
HEMEL HEMPSTEAD
Hertfordshire
HP1 1BA
- Phone:
- 01923232179
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window