ROSSENDALE SPIRITUALIST CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Spiritual healing on Monday evenings,Services held on Tuesday evenings and meditation group on Wednesday evenings.Open to all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 07 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 21 October 2003: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT WILLIAM DAWSON | Chair | 29 August 2003 |
|
|
||||
Julie Butcher | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Wakerley | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Peter Bennion | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Edna MOLLOY | Trustee | 12 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Frankland | Trustee | 05 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 07/04/2020 | 07/04/2021 | 07/04/2022 | 07/04/2023 | 07/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.44k | £0 | £3.24k | £4.72k | £6.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.21k | £319 | £1.73k | £1.85k | £2.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 07 April 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 07 April 2023 | 29 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 07 April 2022 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 07 April 2021 | 25 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 07 April 2020 | 12 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 24 APRIL 2003 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 29 AUGUST 2003
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE SPIRITUALIST RELIGION BY MAINTAINING AN INDEPENDENT CHURCH TO PROMOTE THE TRUTHS AND BELIEFS OF SPIRITUALISM, AND TO HEAL THE SICK AND SUFFERING BY THOUGHT, WORD AND DEED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 Dean Lane
Water
ROSSENDALE
BB4 9RA
- Phone:
- 07536044161
- Email:
- robert_dawson@live.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window