GEORGE FENTHAM HAMPTON IN ARDEN CHARITY

Charity number: 1098618
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TO ADMINISTER THE ALMSHOUSES, OTHER PROPERTIES AND ASSETS OWNED BY THE CHARITY TO GENERATE INCOME. TO APPLY THE INCOME FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS IN THE ALMSHOUSES AND IN CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF HAMPTON IN ARDEN.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £468,277
Total expenditure: £529,866

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Solihull

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 September 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gregory Arthur Lakin Trustee 15 October 2024
EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION OF GEORGE FENTHAM, HAMPTON IN ARDEN
Received: On time
Sarah Alison White Trustee 14 June 2023
HAMPTON-IN-ARDEN SOCIETY
Received: On time
EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION OF GEORGE FENTHAM, HAMPTON IN ARDEN
Received: On time
GLYN COLIN RYLAND Trustee 15 July 2020
CONWAY HALL ETHICAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
INTERNATIONAL LONGEVITY CENTRE-UK
Received: On time
Josephine Anne Oswald Trustee 09 October 2018
EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION OF GEORGE FENTHAM, HAMPTON IN ARDEN
Received: On time
Charles Anthony Rickard Trustee 24 January 2018
EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION OF GEORGE FENTHAM, HAMPTON IN ARDEN
Received: On time
Timothy Joseph Beresford Trustee 12 July 2017
EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION OF GEORGE FENTHAM, HAMPTON IN ARDEN
Received: On time
Alison Jane Rolf Trustee 11 January 2017
AGE CONCERN SOLIHULL
Received: On time
DANIEL ADAMS Trustee 20 January 2016
EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION OF GEORGE FENTHAM, HAMPTON IN ARDEN
Received: On time
Alison Fisher Trustee 01 October 2014
BROMSGROVE DISTRICT HOUSING TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
BOURNVILLE VILLAGE TRUST
Received: On time
EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION OF GEORGE FENTHAM, HAMPTON IN ARDEN
Received: On time
Carol Ann Grant Trustee
CAMERON GRANT MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: On time
HAMPTON-IN-ARDEN SOCIETY
Received: On time
EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION OF GEORGE FENTHAM, HAMPTON IN ARDEN
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £300.95k £408.30k £330.52k £426.05k £468.28k
Total expenditure £308.35k £310.96k £296.63k £389.03k £529.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £2.67k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 07 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 07 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 11 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 11 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 11 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 07 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME DATED 19 MAY 2004
Charitable objects
1. THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE AOB WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, 2. THE PROVISION OF HOUSING ACCOMMODATION FOR HOUSING BENEFICIARIES, 3. THE RELIEF OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AOB WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS, 4. THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AOB IN SUCH CHARITABLE WAY AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT. UNITING DIRECTION MADE 3/9/04 UNDER S96(5) SEE CHARITY 109861
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HAMPTON IN ARDEN
Registration history
  • 09 September 2004 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
George Fentham Meeting Room
Marsh Lane
Hampton-In-Arden
SOLIHULL
West Midlands
B92 0AH
Phone:
01675442017
Website:

No information available