Accounts and annual returns PARK MEAD PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1098996
Charity reporting is overdue by 305 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 305 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 305 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 31 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 August 2022 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 March 2022 271 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 31 March 2021 274 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required