THE SAFE ANCHOR TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aim is to provide free, enjoyable, safe and therapeutic canal boat trips for those in our community who are disadvantaged through physical or mental disabilities, social isolation, age or social deprivation. Travelling in canal time provides a calming experience for our passengers. Supported by the Canal & River Trust, we also help to maintain our local waterways and surrounding environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
130 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- City Of Wakefield
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
Governance
- 15 October 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Moore | Trustee | 24 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Alexander Himsley | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Musgrave | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Paula Michelle Sherriff | Trustee | 31 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Barker | Trustee | 21 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey David Trigg | Trustee | 03 April 2020 |
|
|||||
David Leigh Antcliffe | Trustee | 13 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christine Margaret Clark | Trustee | 17 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Steven Whitelock | Trustee | 17 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Thorburn | Trustee | 14 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £146.47k | £31.84k | £55.36k | £34.65k | £64.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £89.30k | £50.41k | £36.92k | £44.53k | £67.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £20.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 MARCH 2003
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND FOR THE PURPOSE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR PEOPLE IN NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES AND TO THIS END TO APPLY THE ASSETS OF THE COMPANY FOR THE PURPOSE OF OWNING, OPERATING AND MAINTAINING CANAL BOATS AND ANCILLARY CRAFT AND FOR THE PAYING OF ALL FEES OUTGOINGS AND RELATED EXPENSES DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY INCURRED IN CONNECTION WITH THE USE OF SUCH BOATS AND ASSOCIATED FACILITIES BY SUCH GROUPS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE KIRKLEES, WAKEFIELD, BRADFORD, CALDERDALE AND LEEDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gresham House
5-7 St Paul's Street
Leeds
LS1 2JG
- Phone:
- 07740366929
- Email:
- admin@safeanchor.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window