SOUTH ACTON SKILLS AND ARTS COLLABORATIVE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SASAC runs various courses including sewing and computer courses to enable women from ethnic minorities to gain self confidence, meet with other women in a non-threatening environment and to play a part in the wider world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Ealing
Governance
- 27 July 2004: Standard registration
- 22 August 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.33k | £30.06k | £20.45k | £24.02k | £30.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.60k | £23.35k | £18.92k | £21.78k | £24.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 03 August 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2015
(These accounts |
21 December 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 09 December 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 23 April 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/05/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/06/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/04/2013
Charitable objects
3. THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE: TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF ACTON (IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF EALING) AS THE TRUSTEES DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 3.1. ADVANCING EDUCATION INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE FOREGOING, PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT AND TRAINING; 3.2 PRESERVING AND PROTECTING OF HEALTH THROUGH INSTRUCTION AND TRAINING IN NUTRITION; AND 3.3 PROVIDING PRE-SCHOOL AND AFTER-SCHOOL CLUBS AND FACILITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHILDREN IN NEED OF THEM IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE AIM OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
ACTON, LONDON BOROUGH OF EALING
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window