Financial history RIVERSIDE CHURCH TRUST

Charity Number: 1099487
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £898.28k £709.43k £729.82k £781.69k £1.18m
Total expenditure £772.86k £669.10k £798.19k £911.17k £1.01m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £16.84k £23.69k £14.27k £60.78k
Income - Donations and legacies £815.17k £621.00k £629.21k £605.51k £912.56k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £68.36k £28.94k £70.42k £128.29k £76.71k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.31k £1.91k £2.47k £11.32k £12.46k
Income - Other £11.44k £57.58k £27.72k £36.57k £178.24k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £629.21k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £772.86k £669.10k £798.19k £911.17k £1.01m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £4.44k £4.30k £5.01k £5.10k £8.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £28.58k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0