Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ALYN FAMILY DOCTORS

Charity number: 1101201
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £4.73k £2.64k £4.14k £3.70k £3.25k
Total expenditure £2.58k £1.86k £3.59k £4.74k £5.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A