COUSINE ISLAND TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Seeking funds to support conservation work on endemic birds and the hawksbill turtle on Cousine Island in the Seychelles, Indian Ocean
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Seychelles
Governance
- 01 July 2005: Standard registration
- 03 April 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 31 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 18 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 25 July 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 5 NOVEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 25 MAY 2005
Charitable objects
"1. TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION AND RESTORATION OF OCEANIC ISLANDS INCLUDING THEIR ECOSYSTEMS AND ASSOCIATED MARINE ENVIRONMENTS AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THE CONSERVATION AND RESTORATION OF COUSINE ISLAND IN THE SEYCHELLES BY INCLUDING (A) ESTABLISHING OR ASSISTING IN THE ESTABLISHMENT OF SYSTEMS OF SUSTAINABLE MANAGEMENT OF OCEANIC ISLANDS IN GENERAL AND OF COUSINE ISLAND IN PARTICULAR BASED ON INTEGRATED COASTAL MANAGEMENT CONSERVATION PROGRAMMES AND OTHER NON-INTRUSIVE NON-DAMAGING ACTIVITIES; AND (B) THE DEVELOPMENT AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE PARTICIPATION OF LOCAL ISLAND COMMUNITIES IN THE CONSERVATION AND RESTORATION OF THEIR ISLAND ECOSYSTEMS AND ASSOCIATED MARINE ENVIRONMENTS, THE PROTECTION OF NATURAL RESOURCES AND THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE ECOLOGICAL DEVELOPMENT; 2 . TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY: (A) ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING A CENTRE OR CENTRES FOR EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES: AND (B) PROVIDING GRANTS, SCHOLARSHIPS OR ALLOWANCES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL CONSIDER APPROPRIATE"
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window