Accounts and annual returns KATHY EVANS AFGHAN EDUCATION TRUST

Charity Number: 1098360
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2011 25 October 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2009 09 September 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 09 September 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2008 02 September 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 11 September 2009 On Time