THE MARIA NOBREGA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal aims of the Charity are to provide education and employment through the restoration and preservation of architectural and cultural heritage. The Charity Commission has approved an extension of The Charity's activities to enable it to operate world-wide. The requisite Deed of Amendment has been signed by The Board of Trustees and submitted to The Commission.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

16 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Brazil
- Italy
- Libya
- Romania
- United States
Governance
- 19 September 2003: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HRIH ARCHDUKE ANDREAS SALVADOR HAPSBURG- | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Geraldo De Souza Paes De Andrade | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pietro Laureano | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
FRANCESCO BANDARIN | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANNAMARIA BIAGINI CAZZANIGA | Trustee | 01 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
GIUSEPPE BIAGINI | Trustee | 01 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANNE-LOUISE REILLY-AKERS | Trustee | 27 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER ROBIN AKERS | Trustee | 27 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
KATHERINE K DIMANCESCU | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAN P DIMANCESCU | Trustee | 01 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
MRS MARIA ELIZABETH TSAKIROGLOU | Trustee | 01 June 2003 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM LOUIS CHARLES OULLIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DONALD MALCOLM DAVID STRONG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIR PETER WILLIAM HEAP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR ROBERT ADAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN MARGARET DOUGLAS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.62k | £9.22k | £13.46k | £12.01k | £20.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.12k | £9.20k | £13.46k | £12.18k | £20.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 28 MARCH 2003 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 29 AUGUST 2003 AND 17 APRIL 2008
Charitable objects
1. TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE THAT MAY EXIST IN AND AROUND OLINDA, BRAZIL AND ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD,IN BUILDINGS OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST. 2. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY PROVIDING APPRENTICE TRAINING SCHEMES FOR STONEMASONS, CARPENTERS, BLACKSMITHS, ELECTRICIANS, PLUMBERS, GILDERS AND THE TOURISM INDUSTRY. 3. TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF THE PEOPLE OF OLINDA BRAZIL AND ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD, BY THE PROVISION OF HEALTH CARE PROGRAMMES AND CLINICS. 4. TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT.
Area of benefit
OLINDA, BRAZIL, AND ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 13
Empire House
Thurloe Place
LONDON
SW7 2RU
- Phone:
- 07738707375
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window