THE RAMS BANGLA WOMEN'S DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A NON GOVERNMENT, NON PROFIT VOLUNTARY ORGANISATION WORKING FOR SOCIO-ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT OF WOMEN IN BANGLADESH. ONGOING ACTIVITIES INCLUDE THE PROVISION OF MICRO-CREDIT, SKILL DEVELOPMENT TRAINING PRIMARY HEALTH CARE AND NON-FORMAL EDUCATION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
- Bangladesh
Governance
- 24 October 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Burke | Trustee | 14 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
RAUSHAN RAHMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 464 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 464 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 829 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 829 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1194 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1194 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 JUNE 2003 AS AMENDED 8 AUGUST 2003
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE WOMEN OF THE VILLAGE OF DHAKA AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF RACE, OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS, OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID WOMEN. OCCUPATION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID COMMUNITY
Area of benefit
THE VILLAGE OF DHAKA AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
RAMSGATE TANDOORI
17 HARBOUR STREET
RAMSGATE
CT11 8HA
- Phone:
- 01843589134
- Email:
- raushandulan@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window