CHARNOCK OUT OF SCHOOL CLUBS (CHOCS)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide before and after school care for children at Charnock Hall Primary School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 17 February 2004: Standard registration
- 22 January 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 30/09/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.36k | £24.55k | £24.96k | £28.24k | £6.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.78k | £19.37k | £21.13k | £26.00k | £3.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2011 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 FEBRUARY 2002.
Charitable objects
3.1 TO PROVIDE THE NECESSARY FACILITIES FOR THE DAILY CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN DURING OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS AND SCHOOL HOLIDAYS 3.2 TO ADVANCE THE EMPLOYMENT, EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THE PERSONS INVOLVED IN THE PROVISION OF SUCH CARE, EDUCATIONAL AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, CHARNOCK, SHEFFIELD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window