LITTLE FIDGETS PRESCHOOL/PLAYGROUP & TODDLE GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To enhance the development and education of children under primarily under statutory school age by encouraging parents to understand and provide for the needs of their children and through community groups and by offering appropriate play facilities and training courses encouraging the study of such need of such children and their families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
People

8 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Bath And North East Somerset
Governance
- 08 July 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DANIELLE YOUNG | Chair | 30 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
MRS LUCY BOGNOWIEC | Trustee | 21 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
LUCY BAGNOWIEC | Trustee | 30 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
HAYLEY JANE REED | Trustee | 30 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
KELLY SHEPPARD | Trustee | 30 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE BRYANT | Trustee | 30 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
JOHANNA TAMSIN ROUGHAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN CAROLINE PERROTT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.95k | £20.00k | £10.00k | £19.50k | £24.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.82k | £14.97k | £90.05k | £14.70k | £23.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £19.19k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 100 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 100 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 466 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 466 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 831 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 831 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1196 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1196 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 March 2021 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 NOVEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN AND THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY FACILITIES AND TRAINING COURSES, (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES, (3) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO THE AIM OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE FARRINGTON GURNEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Merricott
Main Street
Farrington Gurney
Bristol
BS39 6UB
- Phone:
- 01761453272
- Email:
- littlefidgets@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
littlefidgets.btik.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window