GIRLGUIDING HAGLEY DIVISION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Girlguiding - Hagley Division, Worcestershire, is a small part of a very large female only organisation which provides varied activities - both Indoor and Outdoor - for girls & women from the age of 4 upwards. Our organisation continues to make changes to the Programme we follow.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
254 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Dudley
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 01 September 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ann Williams | Chair | 01 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Patrice Homer | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
sarah Fletcher | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Mandy Knighton | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Coton | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Karen Georgina Rice | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARY ELIZABETH WENHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.66k | £20.32k | £16.82k | £23.99k | £21.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.74k | £13.52k | £22.76k | £30.45k | £19.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 14/12/1922
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF GIRLS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE HAGLEY, WORCESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Manor Abbey Road
HALESOWEN
West Midlands
B62 0AQ
- Phone:
- 07581 149537
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window