JOB'S CLOSE RESIDENTIAL HOME FOR THE ELDERLY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of accommodation and care for the elderly residents of Knowle or Solihull postcode area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,604,486
Donations and legacies | £180 | |
Charitable activities | £1.59m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £6.45k | |
Other | £3.72k |
Total expenditure:
£1,507,719
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.51m | |
Other | £0 |
£15,474 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £122,213 from 2 government contract(s) and £3,718 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.51m | |
Retained for future use | £96.77k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.51m | |
Retained for future use | £112.24k |
People

53 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Solihull
Governance
- 19 January 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW PETER FOULKES | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
ANTONY KEVIN STONEHEWER | Trustee | 21 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
HELEN ELLIS | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|||||||
DR ROWLAND BENNETT HOPKINSON FRCA | Trustee | 07 February 2012 |
|
|
||||||
ELIZABETH MARY BAKER | Trustee |
|
||||||||
ANDREW JOHN HOGARTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
GILLIAN RUTH ARBUTHNOT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
GLENYS LAMB | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.03m | £1.25m | £1.26m | £1.36m | £1.60m | |
|
Total expenditure | £956.10k | £1.05m | £1.07m | £1.31m | £1.51m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £147.61k | £134.45k | £159.26k | £122.21k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £92.96k | £79.21k | £981 | £3.72k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £550 | £5.54k | £70 | £17.75k | £180 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.03m | £1.15m | £1.18m | £1.34m | £1.59m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £32 | £32 | £43 | £1.77k | £6.45k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £92.96k | £79.21k | £981 | £3.72k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £956.10k | £1.05m | £1.07m | £1.31m | £1.51m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £17.54k | £20.11k | £15.75k | £31.09k | £31.92k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.98m | £1.94m | £1.90m | £1.98m | £2.11m | |
|
Long-term investments | £915 | £1.10k | £1.20k | £125.71k | £141.19k | |
|
Other assets | £177.09k | £415.75k | £620.19k | £548.10k | £451.74k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £72.10k | £73.93k | £47.62k | £124.90k | £69.70k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 APRIL 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 16 DECEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ASSIST THE GENERAL GOOD OF OLD PEOPLE IN KNOWLE AND ITS SURROUNDING DISTRICTS WITHIN THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF SOLIHULL AND INCLUDING OLD PEOPLE WHO WERE FORMERLY RESIDENT IN THE AREA OR WHO HAVE FAMILY OR OTHER CONNECTIONS WITH THE AREA BY ASSISTING THE WORK OF STATUTORY AUTHORITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATION ENGAGED IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL RECREATION, DEVELOPING PHYSICAL IMPROVEMENT FURTHERING HEALTH, RELIEVING POVERTY, DISTRESS OR SICKNESS, OR IN PURSUING ANY OBJECTIVES WHICH NOW ARE OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
OLD PEOPLE IN KNOWLE AND ITS SURROUNDING DISTRICTS WITHIN THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF SOLIHULL (SEE OBJECTS).
Contact information
- Address:
-
Jobs Close Residential Home For The Elderly Ltd
Lodge Road
Knowle
SOLIHULL
West Midlands
B93 0HF
- Phone:
- 01564 773499
- Email:
- care@jobsclose.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window