UMU - IGBO KATOLIC COMMUNITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of the Christian religion, Advancement of education, Relief of poverty and sickness, Provision of facilities for recreational and other leisure, Education in the interest of social welfare, Improving the conditions of life of the said Community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 November 2003: Standard registration
- UIKC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FELIX NWAKANMA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTIANA OKOLI | Trustee |
|
||||||
MARIO HENRY AMECHI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REV. FR. CHIKWENDU PASCHAL ANYANWU | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS R OPARA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAJETAN CHIEDOZIE ANYANWU | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHILIP JOE HERBERT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GODSON ECHEBIMA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REV FR. EMEFIENA EZEANI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH AKALAWU | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REV. FATHER BASIL NZE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr GILBERT IGBOAKA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.79k | £9.97k | £4.33k | £4.52k | £3.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.30k | £8.35k | £3.25k | £2.26k | £3.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21 DECEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 14 OCTOBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, PEOPLE OF IGBO ORIGIN, BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION, ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATIONAL AND OTHER LEISURE TIME EDUCATION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID COMMUNITY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
49 MONMOUTH ROAD
DAGENHAM
RM9 5DD
- Phone:
- 07960834220
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window