BRAINTREE HALSTEAD AND WITHAM CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Citizens Advice service helps people resolve their legal, money and other problems by providing free, independent and confidential advice, and by influencing policymakers. Braintree, Halstead & Witham Citizens Advice Bureau is a registered charity reliant on trained volunteers and funds to provide these vital services for local communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
Total income includes £81,084 from 4 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 02 September 2003: Standard registration
- 23 August 2024: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 23 August 2024: Funds transferred to 1113231 Citizens Advice Braintree & South Essex Limited
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £211.44k | £264.52k | £296.72k | £240.79k | £133.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £194.31k | £200.87k | £260.54k | £254.29k | £150.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £171.18k | £198.59k | £268.44k | £186.66k | £81.08k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 11 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 11 August 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 APRIL 2003 as amended on 14 Nov 2018 as amended on 14 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN BRAINTREE DISTRICT AND SURROUNDING AREA ("AREA OF BENEFIT") BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
THE COMMUNITY IN BRAINTREE DISTRICT AND SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window