Financial history CROFTON HAMMOND INFANTS PARENTS AND STAFF ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1098442
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £6.62k £5.68k £8.72k £11.29k £13.86k
Total expenditure £18.90k £5.03k £5.77k £10.59k £14.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A