SONAR BANGLA ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Rochdale
Governance
- 02 December 2003: Standard registration
- 02 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2005 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 OCTOBER 2002 AS AMENDED 6 NOVEMBER 2003.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE BANGLADESHI INHABITANTS OF THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF ROCHDALE, AND IN PARTICULAR THE CASTLEMERE AREA (THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, AND IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE TO PROVIDE RECREATIONAL FACILITIES
Area of benefit
ROCHDALE, PARTICULARLY CASTLEMERE AREA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window