EZER LAYELED LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Family support and advice Hospital Volunteer Service Mentoring and counselling Occupational Therapy & Sensory Integration Physiotherapy Speech & Language Therapy Therapeutic Art
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Manchester City
Governance
- 02 December 2004: Standard registration
- EZER LAYELED (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ben Burton | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
SOLOMON DRESDNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr MICHAEL ARTHUR JOHN WILKS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £144.77k | £160.08k | £156.96k | £155.60k | £175.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £171.12k | £150.57k | £165.00k | £167.08k | £176.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £53.80k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 NOVEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE PERSONS IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS WITHIN THE ORTHODOX JEWISH COMMUNITY WITH A PREFERENCE TO MANCHESTER PARTICULARLY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING, ADVICE, ADVOCACY AND OTHER SUPPORT. 2. TO PROMOTE EDUCATION, PARTICULARLY BY SUPPORTING THE PROVISION OF TUITION FOR CHILDREN WHO HAVE FALLEN BEHIND WITH THEIR EDUCATION, OR ARE AT RISK OF EXCLUSION FROM SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
MANCHESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
400-404 BURY NEW ROAD
SALFORD
M7 4EY
- Phone:
- 01617080606
- Email:
- DP.WHITESIDE@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window