Accounts and annual returns ETHIOPIAN NATIONAL CONSENSUS FORUM

Charity number: 1103925
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2014 07 March 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2013 02 May 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not Required