THE DAVID RUNDLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preservation and protection of good health of the people of Rwanda The relief of poverty, sickness and distress The advancement of education in particular children under the age of 14 years
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Rwanda
Governance
- 17 September 2003: Standard registration
- 25 January 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2013 | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2015 | 05/04/2016 | 05/04/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.62k | £18.55k | £19.03k | £22.03k | £17.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.53k | £12.82k | £25.94k | £21.76k | £27.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2017 | 10 September 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2016 | 12 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2015 | 22 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2014 | 16 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12 JUNE 2003 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 1 SEPTEMBER 2003.
Charitable objects
1) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH OF THE PEOPLE OF RWANDA (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE BENEFICIARIES). 2) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS OF THE SAID BENEFICIARIES. 3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE BENEFICIARIES, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY CHILDREN UNDER THE AGE OF 14 YEARS.
Area of benefit
RWANDA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window