Financial history DAR UL HADITH

Charity number: 1103493
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £229.29k £378.87k £391.15k £395.50k £461.62k
Total expenditure £229.40k £292.14k £404.70k £437.56k £440.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A