STOCKTON PARENT SUPPORT FOR FAMILIES AND SPECIAL NEEDS GROUPS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SPS & Teesside Parent Support provide a holistic service for families and young people 0-25yrs with a wide range of disabilities, a diagnosis is not necessary. Activities and events are offered throughout the whole year and include Family Fun Days, Drama, Singing, Cooking, Sports, Sexual Health, Diabetes Support and Support Groups for both parents and siblings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Darlington
- Hartlepool
- Middlesbrough
- Redcar And Cleveland
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 19 May 2004: Standard registration
- 09 July 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2007 | 31/10/2008 | 31/10/2009 | 31/10/2010 | 31/10/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.36k | £107.11k | £74.30k | £76.25k | £141.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.58k | £88.07k | £78.69k | £89.27k | £152.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2011 | 28 March 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2011 | 28 March 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2010 | 02 August 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2010 | 30 June 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2009 | 26 August 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2009 | 12 August 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 NOVEMBER 2000 AS AMENDED 23 APRIL 2004
Charitable objects
IN CARRYING OUT THESE CHARITABLE OBJECTS SPS WILL SEEK TO CHALLENGE ALL FORMS OF OPPRESSION AND INEQUALITY, PROMOTE EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY FOR ALL AND TO GIVE PRIORITY TO WORKING WITH PEOPLE WHOSE FULL PARTICIPATION IN SOCIETY IS LIMITED BY ECONOMIC, POLITICAL OR SOCIAL DISADVANTAGE. "THE OBJECT OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE: 1. TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT BOROUGH OF STOCKTON-ON-TEES (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") BY ADVANCING EDUCATION AND PROVIDING FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION AND ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS".
Area of benefit
THE INHABITANTS OF THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT BOROUGH OF STOCKTON-ON-TEES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window