Accounts and annual returns GLOBAL ORGANISATION FOR LYSOSOMAL DISEASES

Charity number: 1102478
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 29 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 29 January 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 05 August 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 25 July 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 28 September 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 27 September 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 07 September 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 19 July 2006 On Time