KIMBOLTON SCHOOL

Charity number: 1098586
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The object of the School is to advance education of boys and girls by the provision of a school in or near to the parish of Kimbolton and by ancillary or incidental educational activities and other associated activities for the benefit of the community

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 June 2006: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CLLR JONATHAN ALEXANDER GRAY Chair
None on record
CHRISTOPHER DODD Trustee 30 April 2024
None on record
Helen Hopperton Trustee 01 December 2023
THE OLD KIMBOLTONIANS ASSOCIATION SCHOLARSHIP TRUST FUND
Received: 11 days late
Dr ZAYHEDA KHAN Trustee 22 September 2023
None on record
Marcia Buxton Trustee 09 December 2022
None on record
Dr Richard Smith Trustee 04 November 2022
None on record
Cllr Ian Derek Gardener Trustee 04 September 2020
GRAFHAM VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Dr Pamela Valerie Loughna Trustee 03 September 2020
None on record
Tracey Jane Reid Trustee 23 September 2019
WINWICK VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Debra Ann Hellett Trustee 30 June 2017
None on record
SARAH MARION BRERETON Trustee 08 February 2016
None on record
George Yeandle Trustee 05 December 2014
None on record
Peter J Farrar Trustee 23 May 2012
None on record
SIMON FREDERICK JOHNATHAN PAGE Trustee
None on record
JOHN WILLIAM BRIDGE OBE DL Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £14.83m £15.76m £17.82m £18.61m £20.41m
Total expenditure £14.75m £14.78m £17.04m £18.77m £19.56m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £176.95k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £847.03k £285.84k £212.79k £308.79k £402.35k
Income - Other trading activities £54.73k £48.27k £118.86k £114.58k £119.62k
Income - Charitable activities £13.91m £15.41m £17.46m £18.06m £19.13m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £21.38k £17.95k £29.70k £128.49k £352.14k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £407.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £14.72m £14.76m £16.97m £18.68m £19.48m
Expenditure - Raising funds £31.04k £22.44k £74.00k £86.40k £78.86k
Expenditure - Governance £27.00k £8.55k £5.99k £6.50k £5.20k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Own use assets £44.82m £44.27m £43.51m £42.84m £43.64m
Long-term investments £4 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £2.01m £2.33m £3.40m £4.29m £11.67m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£1.58m -£2.32m -£1.05m £0 £0
Total liabilities £5.85m £4.59m £4.02m £4.40m £11.73m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 17 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 17 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 17 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 17 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 13 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 13 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 18 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 18 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 17 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 17 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION DATED 1 SEPTEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED BY A FURTHER SCHEME DATED 09 OCTOBER 2008
Charitable objects
(1) THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF BOYS AND GIRLS BY THE PROVISION AND CONDUCT OF A SCHOOL IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND BY ANCILLARY OR INCIDENTAL EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND OTHER ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY. (2) SUBJECT TO THE PROVISIONS OF CLAUSE 10 OF THE 2003 SCHEME, THE PROPERTY IDENTIFIED IN PART 1 OF THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME MUST BE RETAINED BY THE TRUSTEE FOR USE FOR THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE. CAMBRIDGESHIRE
Registration history
  • 21 June 2006 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
KIMBOLTON SCHOOL
KIMBOLTON
HUNTINGDON
PE28 0EA
Phone:
01480860505