INDIAN COMMUNITY CENTRE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This Charity offers a Day Care Service for the Elderly to those residing in the City of Nottingham and Nottinghamshire, to help encourage independence amongst the older community. This also extends to offering a Community Luncheon Club providing freshly cooked meals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £16,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Derbyshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 18 March 2005: Standard registration
- ICCA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Subramony Arunachalam | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Surinder Rai | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jagdip Lehal Jagdip Lehal | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jagjivan Kumar Gajree | Trustee | 05 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Balraj Singh Sanghera | Trustee | 05 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Prashant Bhapkar | Trustee | 09 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
Victor Mahal | Trustee | 09 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
KASHMEERA GORECHA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GURMEET SINGH VOHRA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £133.71k | £171.18k | £109.46k | £126.98k | £126.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £154.19k | £157.93k | £111.51k | £118.83k | £123.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £16.00k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £81.14k | £16.00k | £16.00k | £16.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 JULY 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 10 FEBRUARY 2005.
Charitable objects
3.1.1 TO PROMOTE THE BENEFITS OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE CITY OF NOTTINGHAM, THE COUNTY OF NOTTINGHAMSHIRE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOODS OF LONG EATON, SANDIACRE, HEANOR, ILKESTON AND SAWLEY (THE AREA OF BENEFIT) IN PARTICULAR THOSE OF INDIAN ORIGIN, BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. 3.1.2. TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITIES AND VOLUNTARY BODIES IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR THE ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS. 3.1.3. TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF ALL RACIAL GROUPS WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
THE CITY OF NOTTINGHAM, THE COUNTY OF NOTTINGHAMSHIRE, AND NEIGHBOURHOODS OF LONG EATON, SANDIACRE, HEANOR, ILKESTON AND SAWLEY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
INDIAN COMMUNITY CENTRE
FORMAN HOUSE
99 HUCKNALL ROAD
NOTTINGHAM
NG5 1QZ
- Phone:
- 01159693402
- Email:
- enquiries@theicca.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window